ID S1004 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Session Law Chapter 142 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO STATE POLICE -- Adds to and amends existing law to establish the Blue Alert system in Idaho when a suspect for a crime involving the death or serious injury of a peace officer has not been apprehended and law enforcement personnel have determined that the suspect may be a serious threat to the public, or when a peace officer becomes missing while in the line of duty under circumstances warranting concern for such peace officer's safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law to establish the Blue Alert system in Idaho when a suspect for a crime involving the death or serious injury of a peace officer has not been apprehended and law enforcement personnel have determined that the suspect may be a serious threat to the public, or when a peace officer becomes missing while in the line of duty under circumstances warranting concern for such peace officer's safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSession Law Chapter 142 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-20SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-19HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-18SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-15SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-14Houseto Senate
2019-03-14HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-14HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 58-0-12
2019-03-13HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-12HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-03-11HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-08HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-01-30HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-01-30HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-01-29Senateto House
2019-01-29SenateTitle apvd
2019-01-29SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0
2019-01-28SenateRetained on calendar
2019-01-25SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-01-24SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-18SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback