ID S1003 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Session Law Chapter 257 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

HUMAN TRAFFICKING -- Adds to existing law to provide for diversion for a minor victim of human trafficking, to provide certain conditions for diversion, and to provide an affirmative defense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to existing law to provide for diversion for a minor victim of human trafficking, to provide certain conditions for diversion, and to provide an affirmative defense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateSession Law Chapter 257 Effective: 07/01/2019
2019-03-28SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2019-03-27HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2019-03-26SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2019-03-26SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2019-03-25Houseto Senate
2019-03-25HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-25HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-0-7
2019-03-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-22HouseU.C. to place at bottom of Senate bills of third reading calendar Monday, March 25, 2019
2019-03-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-03-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-03-13HouseRead First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2019-03-13HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2019-03-12Senateto House
2019-03-12SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-12SenateRead third time in full as amended -- PASSED 30-0-5
2019-03-08SenateRead second time as amended, filed for Third reading
2019-03-07SenateRead first time as amended, filed for Second Reading
2019-03-07SenateReported engrossed, filed for first reading, as amended
2019-03-07SenateAmendments reported printed
2019-03-07SenateAmendments ordered printed; referred for engrossment
2019-03-07SenateReported out without recommendation, as amended
2019-03-07SenatePlaced in the Committee of the Whole
2019-02-07SenateReferred to 14th Order for amendment
2019-02-06SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-02-05SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-01-18SenateReported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback