ID S1003 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Session Law Chapter 55 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

NURSES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding nurse emeritus licenses; and renewal and reinstatement of nurse licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding nurse emeritus licenses; and renewal and reinstatement of nurse licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-08SenateSession Law Chapter 55 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-02SenateReported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor
2017-03-01HouseReceived from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate
2017-02-28SenateReported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker
2017-02-27SenateReturned From House Passed; referred to enrolling
2017-02-24Houseto Senate
2017-02-24HouseTitle apvd
2017-02-24HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2017-02-23HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-02-22HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2017-02-21HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-14HouseRead First Time, Referred to Health & Welfare
2017-02-14HouseReceived from the Senate, Filed for First Reading
2017-02-13Senateto House
2017-02-13SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-13SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-02-09SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-08SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-01-16SenateReported Printed; referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2017-01-13SenateIntroduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback