ID HJM011 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-06 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating the findings of the Legislature and requesting an Amendments Convention to be called for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
Stating the findings of the Legislature and requesting an Amendments Convention to be called for the purpose of proposing an amendment to the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-06 | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk | |
2012-03-06 | 3rd rdg -- FAILED -- 20-50-0 | |
2012-03-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-29 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-29 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-22 | to St Aff | |
2012-02-22 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-21 | to printing | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | House intro |