ID HJM006 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on March 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on March 19, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AGRICULTURE - Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Congress of the United States to enact bipartisan legislation that reaffirms the FDA as the primary authority in uniform food labeling related to genetic engineering, based on scientific standards regarding health, safety and nutrition; urging that existing FDA labeling rules and guidance, as well as the U.S. Department of Agriculture's National Organic Program provide sufficient standards to address consumer interest in food production practices through the use of truthful and non-misleading voluntary labeling; and urging the commissioner of the FDA to adopt policies, regulations and rules setting standards to address consumer interest in food production practices through voluntary labeling.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Congress of the United States to enact bipartisan legislation that reaffirms the FDA as the primary authority in uniform food labeling related to genetic engineering, based on scientific standards regarding health, safety and nutrition; urging that existing FDA labeling rules and guidance, as well as the U.S. Department of Agriculture's National Organic Program provide sufficient standards to address consumer interest in food production practices through the use of truthful and non-misleading voluntary labeling; and urging the commissioner of the FDA to adopt policies, regulations and rules setting standards to address consumer interest in food production practices through voluntary labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:48 a.m. on March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-13 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Read in full |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-05 | House | ADOPTED -- 41-24-5 |
2015-03-05 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-02 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-25 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |