ID HJM003 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - Recommitted to State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HUMAN RIGHTS - Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the government of Turkey to uphold and safeguard religious and human rights of all its citizens without compromise; to grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, and the right to train clergy of all nationalities; and to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate and all religious and faith traditions.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the government of Turkey to uphold and safeguard religious and human rights of all its citizens without compromise; to grant the Ecumenical Patriarch appropriate international recognition, ecclesiastical succession, and the right to train clergy of all nationalities; and to respect the property rights and human rights of the Ecumenical Patriarchate and all religious and faith traditions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Recommitted to State Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-05 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-05 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-05 | House | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2015-03-05 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-04 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-03 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-03-02 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2015/HJM003.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2015/HJM003.pdf |