ID HJM001 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:24 a.m. on February 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:24 a.m. on February 22, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH -- Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Federal Communications Commission and Congress take action to create a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline with a three-digit number.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Federal Communications Commission and Congress take action to create a national suicide prevention and mental health crisis hotline with a three-digit number.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:24 a.m. on February 22, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-02-18 | Senate | to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-04 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-04 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 62-8-0 |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |