ID HCR058 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BROADBAND SERVICE - Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Idaho Department of Commerce investigate improving broadband service in Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the Idaho Department of Commerce investigate improving broadband service in Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-22 | House | ADOPTED -- 57-10-3 |
2016-03-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |