ID HCR055 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:07 p.m. on March 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-25 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:07 p.m. on March 24, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND GAME - RULE REJECTION - Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Idaho Department of Fish and Game relating to the Trapping of Predatory and Unprotected Wildlife and the Taking of Furbearing Animals.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Idaho Department of Fish and Game relating to the Trapping of Predatory and Unprotected Wildlife and the Taking of Furbearing Animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 3:07 p.m. on March 24, 2016 |
2016-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-22 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-17 | House | Wood |
2016-03-17 | House | 66-0-4 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Erpelding, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Jordan, Kauffman, Kerby, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McCrostie, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Rusche, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wintrow, Wood, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Malek, McDonald, Moyle, Rubel Floor Sponsor |
2016-03-17 | House | ADOPTED |
2016-03-17 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times |
2016-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |