ID HCR052 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - Ret'd to Res/Env
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-12 - Ret'd to Res/Env
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting certain rules of the Department of Fish and Game relating to public use of the lands owned or controlled by the Department of Fish and Game.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting certain rules of the Department of Fish and Game relating to public use of the lands owned or controlled by the Department of Fish and Game.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-12 | Ret'd to Res/Env | |
2010-03-09 | to 10th Ord | |
2010-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-05 | to Res/Env | |
2010-03-05 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-05 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-04 | to Senate | |
2010-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-04 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 66-0-4 | |
2010-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-26 | to printing | |
2010-02-26 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-26 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/HCR052.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/HCR052.pdf |