ID HCR050 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Referred to Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CIVICS TEST - Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the State Board of Education adopt rules to provide for Idaho state government and Idaho history questions for the civics test given to high school seniors starting with the 2017-18 school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and requesting that the State Board of Education adopt rules to provide for Idaho state government and Idaho history questions for the civics test given to high school seniors starting with the 2017-18 school year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17SenateReferred to Education
2016-03-15SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day
2016-03-08SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Education
2016-03-08SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2016-03-07Houseto Senate
2016-03-07HouseTitle apvd
2016-03-07HouseADOPTED -- 66-4-0
2016-03-07HouseRead Third Time in Full
2016-03-04HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 7, 2016
2016-03-03HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2016-03-02HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2016-03-01HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback