ID HCR050 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-06 - U.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Stating findings of the Legislature and proclaiming the month of March 2014 as Social Work Recognition Month and calling upon all citizens to join with the National Association of Social Workers in celebration and support of the social work profession.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Stating findings of the Legislature and proclaiming the month of March 2014 as Social Work Recognition Month and calling upon all citizens to join with the National Association of Social Workers in celebration and support of the social work profession.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-06HouseU.C. to be returned to Health & Welfare Committee
2014-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2014-03-04HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2014-03-03HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback