ID HCR044 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - to Health/Wel
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-08 - to Health/Wel
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Department of Health and Welfare to promulgate a certain rule.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and urging the Department of Health and Welfare to promulgate a certain rule.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-08 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-08 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-07 | to Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-07 | McGeachin | |
2012-03-07 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-05 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-23 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-22 | to printing | |
2012-02-22 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-22 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/HCR044.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2012/HCR044.pdf |