ID HCR042 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:44 a.m. on March 2, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:44 a.m. on March 2, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MATT PARADIS - Stating findings of the Legislature and congratulating Idahoan Matt Paradis for his part in Denver Broncos' Super Bowl win.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and congratulating Idahoan Matt Paradis for his part in Denver Broncos' Super Bowl win.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:44 a.m. on March 2, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-02-26 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-02-25 | Senate | to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-02-25 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-16 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-16 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-16 | House | Kerby & Boyle |
2016-02-16 | House | voice vote Floor Sponsors |
2016-02-16 | House | ADOPTED |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2016-02-16 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/HCR042.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2016/HCR042.pdf |