ID HCR039 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:52 a.m. on March 14, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-15 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:52 a.m. on March 14, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PARDONS AND PAROLE COMMISSION - RULE REJECTION - Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho Commission of Pardons and Parole relating to Rules of the Commission of Pardons and Parole.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule of the Idaho Commission of Pardons and Parole relating to Rules of the Commission of Pardons and Parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:52 a.m. on March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-14 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-08 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-08 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read in full |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-29 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-29 | House | ADOPTED -- 67-0-3 |
2016-02-29 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-26 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 29, 2016 |
2016-02-25 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-24 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-02-17 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |