ID HCR037 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:40 a.m. on March 21, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:40 a.m. on March 21, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FEE RULES -- HOUSE AND SENATE AGRICULTURAL AFFAIRS COMMITTEES -- Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge reviewed by the House and Senate Agricultural Affairs Committees.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and approving administrative rules that impose a fee or charge reviewed by the House and Senate Agricultural Affairs Committees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 9:40 a.m. on March 21, 2022 |
2022-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-07 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-07 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 67-1-2 |
2022-03-04 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2022-02-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |