ID HCR031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:42 a.m. on March 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:42 a.m. on March 28, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEMIQUINCENTENNIAL -- States findings of the Legislature and declares the years 2024 through 2027 as the period of commemoration for America250 in Idaho.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and declares the years 2024 through 2027 as the period of commemoration for America250 in Idaho.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:42 a.m. on March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-26 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED 32-2-1 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 67-0-3 |
2024-03-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-27 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |