ID HCR029 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:29 a.m. on March 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:29 a.m. on March 20, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RULE REJECTION -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- States findings of the Legislature and rejects certain rules of the Department of Administration relating to Rules of the Division of Purchasing.
Title
States findings of the Legislature and rejects certain rules of the Department of Administration relating to Rules of the Division of Purchasing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 11:29 a.m. on March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2024-02-29 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-26 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |