ID HCR021 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:25 p.m. on April 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:25 p.m. on April 27, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LEMHI BASIN -- States findings of the legislature and directs the Idaho Water Resource Board to continue to work expeditiously with local water users to complete a comprehensive settlement that resolves current tensions and conflicts over the use of Lemhi Basin high flows.
Title
States findings of the legislature and directs the Idaho Water Resource Board to continue to work expeditiously with local water users to complete a comprehensive settlement that resolves current tensions and conflicts over the use of Lemhi Basin high flows.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-29 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:25 p.m. on April 27, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-27 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-04-26 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-04-20 | House | to Senate |
2021-04-20 | House | Title apvd |
2021-04-20 | House | Previously Read in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2021-04-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-04-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |