ID HCR018 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Delivered to Secretary of State on 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and recounting the history of the discovery of gold in Idaho and the George Grimes monument and officially recognizing the Idaho Sesquicentennial Celebration and the Gold 2012 Committee.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and recounting the history of the discovery of gold in Idaho and the George Grimes monument and officially recognizing the Idaho Sesquicentennial Celebration and the Gold 2012 Committee.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Delivered to Secretary of State on 03/16 | |
2011-03-16 | To Secretary of State | |
2011-03-15 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-14 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-14 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-11 | To enrol | |
2011-03-10 | to House | |
2011-03-10 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-10 | Corder | |
2011-03-10 | voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-10 | ADOPTED | |
2011-03-10 | 10th Ord | |
2011-03-09 | to 10th Ord | |
2011-03-09 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-09 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-07 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-04 | to Senate | |
2011-03-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-04 | Nielsen | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- voice vote Floor Sponsor | |
2011-03-02 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-01 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-28 | to printing | |
2011-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-28 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/HCR018.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2011/HCR018.pdf |