ID HCR011 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - to Res/Env
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - to Res/Env
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain pending rule docket of the Idaho Department of Fish and Game relating to Rules Governing the Taking of Game Birds in the State of Idaho.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain pending rule docket of the Idaho Department of Fish and Game relating to Rules Governing the Taking of Game Birds in the State of Idaho.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | to Res/Env | |
2011-02-24 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-24 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-23 | to Senate | |
2011-02-23 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-23 | 3rd rdg -- ADOPTED -- 65-5-0 | |
2011-02-22 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-22 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-21 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-21 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-18 | to printing | |
2011-02-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-18 | House intro |