ID HCR010 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 15, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATER -- Stating findings of the Legislature and supporting the 2018 settlement agreement between the cities, the Surface Water Coalition, and members of Idaho Ground Water Appropriators; supporting state management through the ESPA Ground Water Management Area; and supporting the continued funding and implementation of efforts to stabilize and reverse the trend of declining water levels in the ESPA.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and supporting the 2018 settlement agreement between the cities, the Surface Water Coalition, and members of Idaho Ground Water Appropriators; supporting state management through the ESPA Ground Water Management Area; and supporting the continued funding and implementation of efforts to stabilize and reverse the trend of declining water levels in the ESPA.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 10:14 a.m. on March 15, 2019 |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-13 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-02-18 | House | to Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Title apvd |
2019-02-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2019-02-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2019-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/HCR010/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2019/legislation/HCR010.pdf |