ID HCR002 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ORDERS OF THE GOVERNOR -- States findings of the Legislature and declares that the portion of the December 30, 2020, order regarding the prohibition on gatherings of more than 10 people is null, void, and of no force and effect.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

States findings of the Legislature and declares that the portion of the December 30, 2020, order regarding the prohibition on gatherings of more than 10 people is null, void, and of no force and effect.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
2021-01-26SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2021-01-25Houseto Senate
2021-01-25HouseTitle apvd
2021-01-25HousePreviously Read in Full -- ADOPTED 55-15-0
2021-01-25HouseRead Third Time in Full
2021-01-21HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 25, 2021
2021-01-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2021-01-19HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2021-01-15HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2021-01-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback