ID HCR001 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:31 a.m. on January 11, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 7 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:31 a.m. on January 11, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Title
Provides for a joint session of the House of Representatives and the Senate to hear the Governor's State of the State Address.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Moyle [R] | Rep. John Rusche [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-14 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State at 8:31 a.m. on January 11, 2013 |
2013-01-11 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Secretary of State |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-01-09 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-01-08 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-01-07 | Senate | to House |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Davis |
2013-01-07 | Senate | voice vote Floor Sponsor |
2013-01-07 | Senate | ADOPTED |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Introduced; read first time at length |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-01-07 | House | to Senate |
2013-01-07 | House | Title apvd |
2013-01-07 | House | Moyle |
2013-01-07 | House | voice vote Floor Sponsor |
2013-01-07 | House | ADOPTED |
2013-01-07 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 64 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 6, read three times |
2013-01-07 | House | Reported Printed and Held at Desk |
2013-01-07 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/HCR001.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2013/HCR001.pdf |