ID H0727 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2024 Session Law Chapter 272 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2024 Session Law Chapter 272 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES -- Adds to existing law to prohibit public utilities from requiring the disclosure of full social security numbers as a condition of receiving any product, commodity, or service provided by the public utility and to provide an exception.
Title
Adds to existing law to prohibit public utilities from requiring the disclosure of full social security numbers as a condition of receiving any product, commodity, or service provided by the public utility and to provide an exception.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2024 Session Law Chapter 272 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on April 3, 2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-04-02 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-04-02 | Senate | to House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-26 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-26 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-03-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |