ID H0726 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - April 10, 2024 Session Law Chapter 330 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - April 10, 2024 Session Law Chapter 330 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2025.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2025.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | April 10, 2024 Session Law Chapter 330 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Law without signature |
2024-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:15 p.m. on April 4, 2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-04-03 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-04-03 | Senate | to House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 21-14-0 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Ret’d to 3rd Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Finance |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-22 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 38-31-1 |
2024-03-22 | House | Reconsidered |
2024-03-22 | House | Cannon |
2024-03-22 | House | Absent |
2024-03-22 | House | Achilles, Berch, Blanksma, Burns, Chew(Beazer), Crane(13), Dixon(24), Galaviz, Gannon, Garner, Green, Lanting, Mathias, McCann, Necochea, Nelsen, Roberts, Rubel, Sauter, Wheeler, Yamamoto |
2024-03-22 | House | Alfieri, Allgood, Andrus, Barbieri, Boyle, Bundy, Cheatum, Clow, Cornilles, Crane(12), Dixon(1), Durrant, Ehardt, Ehlers, Erickson, Furniss, Gallagher, Handy, Hawkins, Healey, Hill, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kingsley, Lambert, Manwaring, Mendive, Mickelsen, Miller, Mitchell, Monks, Palmer, Petzke, Pickett, Price, Raybould, Raymond, Redman, Scott, Shepherd, Skaug, Tanner, Vander Woude, Weber(Mendenhall), Wisniewski, Wroten, Young, Mr. Speaker NAYS |
2024-03-22 | House | PASSED 48-21-1 AYES |
2024-03-22 | House | Motion to reconsider |
2024-03-22 | House | Held at Desk |
2024-03-22 | House | Notice to reconsider |
2024-03-22 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2024-03-22 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-03-22 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |