ID H0714 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 301 Effective: 04/11/10 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/10 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 301 Effective: 04/11/10 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/10 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reduces the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare by $68,500 for Service Integration for fiscal year 2010; appropriates an additional $800,000 to the Department of Health and Welfare for Service Integration for fiscal year 2010; appropriates $4,281,400 to the Department of Health and Welfare for Service Integration for fiscal year 2011; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions; provides that the State Controller shall make transfers from the General Fund; directs that funds for trustee and benefit payments shall not be transferred; provides legislative intent for the education stipend for Department of Health and Welfare Employees; allows transfers between personnel costs and operating expenditures; provides legislative intent for program integrity; and directs the Head Start appropriations from the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families funds.
Title
Reduces the appropriation to the Department of Health and Welfare by $68,500 for Service Integration for fiscal year 2010; appropriates an additional $800,000 to the Department of Health and Welfare for Service Integration for fiscal year 2010; appropriates $4,281,400 to the Department of Health and Welfare for Service Integration for fiscal year 2011; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions; provides that the State Controller shall make transfers from the General Fund; directs that funds for trustee and benefit payments shall not be transferred; provides legislative intent for the education stipend for Department of Health and Welfare Employees; allows transfers between personnel costs and operating expenditures; provides legislative intent for program integrity; and directs the Head Start appropriations from the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families funds.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 301 Effective: 04/11/10 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/10 All other sections | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-29 | to House | |
2010-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-29 | Bair | |
2010-03-29 | 34-0-1 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Coiner, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Geddes, Goedde, Hammond, Heinrich, Hill, Jorgenson, Kelly, Kerby(Keough), LeFavour, Lodge, McGee, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Pearce, Schroeder, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett(Stennett), Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Malepeai Floor Sponsor | |
2010-03-29 | PASSED | |
2010-03-29 | Rls susp | |
2010-03-29 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-29 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-26 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-26 | to Fin | |
2010-03-26 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-26 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-26 | to Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-26 | Jaquet | |
2010-03-26 | 54-1-15 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barrett, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Collins, Cronin, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Jarvis, Killen, King, Labrador, Lake, Loertscher, Marriott, Mathews, McGeachin, Moyle, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Raybould, Ringo, Rusche, Sayler, Shepherd(08), Shirley, Simpson, Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi, Thayn, Trail, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Durst Absent and excused -- Black, Boe, Chavez, Chew, Clark, Crane, Kren, Luker, Pasley-Stuart, Roberts, Ruchti, Schaefer, Shepherd(02), Smith(30), Thompson Floor Sponsor | |
2010-03-26 | PASSED | |
2010-03-26 | Rls susp | |
2010-03-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-25 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-24 | to printing | |
2010-03-24 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-24 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0714.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0714.pdf |