ID H0712 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2024 Session Law Chapter 263 Effective: 04/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2024 Session Law Chapter 263 Effective: 04/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
ESTRAYS -- Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding certain time requirements, penalties and damages, and charges for care and to establish provisions regarding willfully and wantonly allowing estrays.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to revise provisions regarding certain time requirements, penalties and damages, and charges for care and to establish provisions regarding willfully and wantonly allowing estrays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2024 Session Law Chapter 263 Effective: 04/01/2024 |
2024-04-02 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:17 p.m. on March 29, 2024 |
2024-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | to enrol |
2024-03-28 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-28 | House | Read third time in full as amended in Senate -- PASSED 55-13-2 |
2024-03-27 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-26 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2024-03-26 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2024-03-26 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2024-03-26 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2024-03-26 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to House |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 27-8-0 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-18 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-18 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-18 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-03-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-15 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2024-03-13 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |