ID H0708 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH -- Amends existing law to provide that a person shall not be required to be vaccinated for coronavirus or have a vaccine passport to apply for or receive government services, to enter or remain in a government venue, or to be hired by the state or maintain employment with the state.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a person shall not be required to be vaccinated for coronavirus or have a vaccine passport to apply for or receive government services, to enter or remain in a government venue, or to be hired by the state or maintain employment with the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-03 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-03 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2022-03-03 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2022-03-01 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |