ID H0694 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- MILLENNIUM FUND -- Provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2019; and provides that any remaining unexpended and unencumbered moneys in the Idaho Millennium Income Fund shall be transferred to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund at the end of fiscal year 2019.
Title
Provides that certain unexpended and unencumbered moneys shall revert to the Idaho Millennium Income Fund at the end of fiscal year 2019; and provides that any remaining unexpended and unencumbered moneys in the Idaho Millennium Income Fund shall be transferred to the Idaho Millennium Permanent Endowment Fund at the end of fiscal year 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 304 Effective: 07/01/2018 |
2018-03-23 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018 |
2018-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2018-03-21 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2018-03-21 | Senate | to House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Title apvd |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2018-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2018-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2018-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2018-03-16 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2018-03-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |