ID H0691 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 302 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- PERMANENT BUILDING FUND -- Appropriates $77,772,000 from the Permanent Building Fund for fiscal year 2019; authorizes the allocation of funds for specific projects for fiscal year 2019; provides for a General Fund cash transfer; provides legislative intent regarding utilization of matching funds; provides legislative intent regarding reallocation of project savings; and provides direction on the timing of the use of funds for a specific project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $77,772,000 from the Permanent Building Fund for fiscal year 2019; authorizes the allocation of funds for specific projects for fiscal year 2019; provides for a General Fund cash transfer; provides legislative intent regarding utilization of matching funds; provides legislative intent regarding reallocation of project savings; and provides direction on the timing of the use of funds for a specific project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 302 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-21HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-03-20SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-19SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-19SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-19SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-16Houseto Senate
2018-03-16HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-16HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-16HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-15HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-03-14HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback