ID H0686 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 249 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 249 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,076,400 to the Office of Drug Policy for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 3; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $1,076,400 to the Office of Drug Policy for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 3; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 249 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/29 | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-28 | To enrol | |
2012-03-28 | to House | |
2012-03-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2012-03-27 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-27 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-26 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-26 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-23 | to Fin | |
2012-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-23 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-22 | to Senate | |
2012-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 68-0-2 | |
2012-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-19 | to printing | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | House intro |