ID H0684 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 311 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 311 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the State Athletic Commission to revise definitions; to provide the commission authority to establish certain fees, to provide additional nationally recognized sanctioning associations and to provide requirements for certain promoters; to revise provisions relating to bond or other security filed by promoters; to require a payment of fees for the issuance of a license or sanctioning permit; to revise provisions relating to a statement and report of an event and to provide requirements relating to the payment of a certain tax to the commission; to revise provisions relating to a certain statement and report of an event; and to revise provisions relating to prohibitions and penalties.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the State Athletic Commission to revise definitions; to provide the commission authority to establish certain fees, to provide additional nationally recognized sanctioning associations and to provide requirements for certain promoters; to revise provisions relating to bond or other security filed by promoters; to require a payment of fees for the issuance of a license or sanctioning permit; to revise provisions relating to a statement and report of an event and to provide requirements relating to the payment of a certain tax to the commission; to revise provisions relating to a certain statement and report of an event; and to revise provisions relating to prohibitions and penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 311 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-29 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-29 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-29 | To enrol | |
2010-03-29 | to House | |
2010-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-26 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-26 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-22 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-22 | to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2010-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | Rpt prt | |
2010-03-17 | to printing | |
2010-03-17 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-17 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0684.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0684.pdf |