ID H0682 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 7; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 7; 07/01/12 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $1,916,400,800 to the divisions of Medical Assistance Services and Licensing and Certification within the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions for those two divisions to 268; provides legislative intent; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $1,916,400,800 to the divisions of Medical Assistance Services and Licensing and Certification within the Department of Health and Welfare for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions for those two divisions to 268; provides legislative intent; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 247 Effective: 04/03/12 Section 7; 07/01/12 All other sections | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/28 | |
2012-03-28 | To Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-27 | To enrol | |
2012-03-26 | to House | |
2012-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 29-4-2 | |
2012-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-22 | to Fin | |
2012-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-21 | to Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | Wood(27) | |
2012-03-21 | 52-14-4 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hartgen, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, King, Lacey, Loertscher, Luker, McGeachin, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Rusche, Schaefer, Shirley, Smith(30), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, Boyle, Hart, Harwood, Marriott, McMillan, Nonini, Palmer, Roberts, Shepherd, Simpson, Sims, Wood(35) Absent and excused -- Bayer, Killen, Lake, Smith(24) Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-21 | PASSED | |
2012-03-21 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-19 | to printing | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | House intro |