ID H0675 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 240 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 240 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $15,094,700 to the Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time positions to 137.25; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Title
Appropriates $15,094,700 to the Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2013; limits the number of full-time positions to 137.25; and provides guidance for employee compensation and benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 240 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-29 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/28 | |
2012-03-28 | To Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-27 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-27 | To enrol | |
2012-03-26 | to House | |
2012-03-26 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-26 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2012-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-21 | to Fin | |
2012-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-21 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-20 | to Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | Ringo | |
2012-03-20 | 64-4-2 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Henderson, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Rusche, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Hartgen, Harwood, Schaefer, Wood(35) Absent and excused -- Higgins, Roberts Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-20 | PASSED | |
2012-03-20 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-20 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-16 | to printing | |
2012-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-16 | House intro |