ID H0653 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 132 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DIVISION OF FINANCIAL MANAGEMENT -- Appropriates $1,958,700 to the Division of Financial Management for fiscal year 2019; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 15.00.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $1,958,700 to the Division of Financial Management for fiscal year 2019; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 15.00.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 19, 2018 Session Law Chapter 132 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-15HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:15 p.m. on March 14, 2018
2018-03-14HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-14SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-14SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-13HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-09Senateto House
2018-03-09SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-09SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3
2018-03-07SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-06SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2018-03-05SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-02Houseto Senate
2018-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-02HouseRules Suspended:
2018-03-02HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-01HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback