ID H0645 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 224 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 224 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to salaries of members of the Public Utilities Commission, members of the Tax Commission and members of the Industrial Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Public Utilities Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the State Tax Commission; and to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Industrial Commission.
Title
Amends existing law relating to salaries of members of the Public Utilities Commission, members of the Tax Commission and members of the Industrial Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Public Utilities Commission; to provide for an increase in salary for members of the State Tax Commission; and to provide for an increase in salary for members of the Industrial Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 224 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-27 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/26 | |
2012-03-26 | To Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-23 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-22 | To enrol | |
2012-03-21 | to House | |
2012-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2012-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-14 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-14 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-13 | to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-13 | Black | |
2012-03-13 | 39-22-9 AYES -- Anderson, Bedke, Bell, Black, Block(Block), Bolz, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hartgen, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Luker, Moyle, Nesset, Patrick, Pence, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Wills, Wood(27), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Boyle, Guthrie, Hart, Harwood, Henderson, Lake, Loertscher, Marriott, McMillan(McMillan), Nielsen, Nonini, Perry, Schaefer, Shepherd, Simpson, Sims, Vander Woude Absent and excused -- Batt, Bilbao, Crane, Hagedorn, Higgins, McGeachin, Palmer, Shirley, Wood(35) Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-13 | PASSED | |
2012-03-13 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-12 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt prt | |
2012-03-09 | to printing | |
2012-03-09 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-09 | House intro |