ID H0643 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- ATTORNEY GENERAL -- Relates to the appropriation to the Attorney General for fiscal year 2021.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Attorney General for fiscal year 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 308 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-3-3 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-17 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-17 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-17 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-16 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |