ID H0637 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 221 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 221 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $79,719,300 for the Educational Support Program/Division of Administrators for fiscal year 2015; and amends existing law to increase the salary-based apportionment for administrators.
Title
Appropriates $79,719,300 for the Educational Support Program/Division of Administrators for fiscal year 2015; and amends existing law to increase the salary-based apportionment for administrators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 221 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Mortimer |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- McKenzie Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-19 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | House | Eskridge |
2014-03-19 | House | 48-21-1 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Clow, Collins, Crane, DeMordaunt, Eskridge, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, Meline, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Romrell, Shepherd, Smith, Stevenson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Barrett, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Dayley, Denney, Erpelding, Gannon, Harris, King, Kloc, McMillan, Mendive, Pence, Ringo, Rubel, Rusche, Sims, Wood(35), Woodings Absent -- Thompson Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 67 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 3, read three times |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-18 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |