ID H0635 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-25 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-25 - Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CITIES -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding city annexations.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding city annexations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Failed; Filed in the office of the Chief Clerk |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Ret’d to House |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Read third time in full -- FAILED 12-19-4 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-03-02 | House | to Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Title apvd |
2022-03-02 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-4-2 |
2022-03-01 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Local Government |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |