ID H0623 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

IDAHO ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEDURE ACT -- Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise procedures for contested cases and hearing officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals, amends and adds to existing law to revise procedures for contested cases and hearing officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-03-07SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-06Houseto Senate
2018-03-06HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 47-23-0
2018-03-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-03-02HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-23HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-02-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback