ID H0616 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
CHILDREN'S MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES -- Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the disclosure of information in certain instances and to authorize access to mental health records of a child in certain instances.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding the disclosure of information in certain instances and to authorize access to mental health records of a child in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-04 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-04 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2 |
2024-03-01 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-29 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2024-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |