ID H0615 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATER -- Amends existing law to provide that a party asserting that a water right has been forfeited has the burden of proving the forfeiture, to provide that certain water rights shall not be lost or forfeited for nonuse, and to provide for third-party claims of right.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a party asserting that a water right has been forfeited has the burden of proving the forfeiture, to provide that certain water rights shall not be lost or forfeited for nonuse, and to provide for third-party claims of right.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2020 Session Law Chapter 296 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on March 19, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-03-13 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-13 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2020-03-13 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-12 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |