ID H0610 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 205 Effective: 03/26/2014 Section 4; 07/01/2014 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 205 Effective: 03/26/2014 Section 4; 07/01/2014 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates a total of $68,346,400 to the Idaho State Police for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 548.07; provides guidance for employee compensation; amends Chapter 235, Laws of 2013, by the addition of a new Section 4; and provides certain non-General Fund reappropriation for fiscal year 2015.
Title
Appropriates a total of $68,346,400 to the Idaho State Police for fiscal year 2015; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 548.07; provides guidance for employee compensation; amends Chapter 235, Laws of 2013, by the addition of a new Section 4; and provides certain non-General Fund reappropriation for fiscal year 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 205 Effective: 03/26/2014 Section 4; 07/01/2014 All other sections |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on March 19, 2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-18 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Lacey |
2014-03-17 | Senate | 35-0-0 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Tucker(Hagedorn), Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | House | Bolz |
2014-03-12 | House | 62-5-3 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Burgoyne, Gannon, Rusche, Sims Absent -- Andrus, Malek, Shepherd Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-12 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |