ID H0603 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 8, 2024 Session Law Chapter 301 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 8, 2024 Session Law Chapter 301 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
STATE GOVERNMENT -- Adds to existing law to prohibit state agencies from donating to or sponsoring a nongovernmental event or organization and to provide exceptions.
Title
Adds to existing law to prohibit state agencies from donating to or sponsoring a nongovernmental event or organization and to provide exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 8, 2024 Session Law Chapter 301 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:56 p.m. on April 3, 2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-04-03 | House | to enrol |
2024-04-03 | House | Title apvd |
2024-04-03 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2024-04-03 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2024-04-02 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2024-04-02 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2024-04-02 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2024-04-02 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2024-04-02 | Senate | to House |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate -- PASSED 27-6-2 |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2024-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 50-19-1 |
2024-03-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |