ID H0601 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the definition of "reimbursement rate" by removing a sunset provision.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of "reimbursement rate" by removing a sunset provision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 26, 2014 Session Law Chapter 258 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:50 p.m. on March 20, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Martin |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 34-0-1 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Brackett, Buckner-Webb, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Bock Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-19 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-12 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-12 | House | Wood(27) |
2014-03-12 | House | 69-0-1 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent -- Andrus Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-12 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-12 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-12 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |