ID H0584 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise provisions relating to those considered to be in active military service.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions relating to those considered to be in active military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 28, 2014 Session Law Chapter 324 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:10 p.m. on March 24, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-20 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Guthrie |
2014-03-20 | Senate | 32-0-3 AYES -- Bair, Bayer, Bock, Brackett, Cameron, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Heider, Johnson, Keough, Lacey, Lakey, Lodge, Martin, Mortimer, Nonini, Nuxoll, Patrick, Pearce, Rice, Schmidt, Siddoway, Stennett, Thayn, Tippets, Vick, Ward-Engelking, Werk, Winder NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Buckner-Webb, Hill, McKenzie Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-20 | Senate | PASSED |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read in full as required) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-03-10 | House | to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Title apvd |
2014-03-10 | House | Perry |
2014-03-10 | House | 70-0-0 AYES -- Agidius, Anderson(01), Anderson(31), Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Bolz, Boyle, Burgoyne, Chew, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Denney, Erpelding, Eskridge, Gannon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Hancey, Harris, Hartgen, Henderson, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, King, Kloc, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Meline, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Morse, Moyle, Nielsen, Packer, Palmer, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Romrell, Rubel, Rusche, Shepherd, Sims, Smith, Stevenson, Thompson, Trujillo, VanOrden, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Woodings, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor |
2014-03-10 | House | PASSED |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 69 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 1, read three times |
2014-03-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2014-03-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |