ID H0575 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2022 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 31 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2022 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 01/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COUNTY PROPERTY -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding lease to purchase arrangements for courthouses and jails.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding lease to purchase arrangements for courthouses and jails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2022 Session Law Chapter 319 Effective: 01/01/2023 |
2022-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2022-03-23 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2022-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 24-11-0 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2022-02-23 | House | to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | Title apvd |
2022-02-23 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 53-15-2 |
2022-02-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2022-02-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Local Government |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |