ID H0555 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to administrative procedures to provide that the time period in which certain motions for reconsideration, petitions for review and petitions for judicial review must be filed, and the time period after which orders become effective, be calculated from the date of service rather than the date of issuance; and to provide for the service of orders and proof of service.
Title
Amends existing law relating to administrative procedures to provide that the time period in which certain motions for reconsideration, petitions for review and petitions for judicial review must be filed, and the time period after which orders become effective, be calculated from the date of service rather than the date of issuance; and to provide for the service of orders and proof of service.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 255 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-03-29 | To Governor | |
2010-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2010-03-26 | Sp signed | |
2010-03-26 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-03-25 | To enrol | |
2010-03-24 | to House | |
2010-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2010-03-19 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-03-18 | rec d/p | |
2010-03-18 | Rpt out | |
2010-03-03 | to St Aff | |
2010-03-03 | 1st rdg | |
2010-03-03 | Senate intro | |
2010-03-02 | to Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Title apvd | |
2010-03-02 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2010-02-26 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-26 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-25 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-25 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-25 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-17 | to St Aff | |
2010-02-17 | Rpt prt | |
2010-02-16 | to printing | |
2010-02-16 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-16 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0555.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0555.pdf |