ID H0554 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 295 Effective: 07/01/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

SAFETY RESTRAINTS -- Repeals and amends existing law to provide that failure to use a safety restraint shall not be considered as evidence of contributory or comparative negligence or in any civil action regarding negligence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals and amends existing law to provide that failure to use a safety restraint shall not be considered as evidence of contributory or comparative negligence or in any civil action regarding negligence.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2018 Session Law Chapter 295 Effective: 07/01/2018
2018-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 5:18 p.m. on March 22, 2018
2018-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2018-03-22SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2018-03-22SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2018-03-22HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2018-03-21HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2018-03-21Senateto House
2018-03-21SenateTitle apvd
2018-03-21SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 34-0-1
2018-03-21SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2018-03-21SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2018-03-20SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2018-03-02SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2018-03-02SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2018-03-01Houseto Senate
2018-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2018-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1
2018-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2018-02-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2018-02-23HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2018-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules & Administration
2018-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback